Council | 12/01/2023 | Act A25-0319 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 015481, Expires on Feb 19, 2024 | ||
Council | 11/27/2023 | Returned from Mayor | ||
Council | 11/21/2023 | Enacted without Mayor's Signature with Act Number A25-0319, Expires on Feb 19, 2024 | ||
Council | 11/17/2023 | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on December 4, 2023 | ||
Council | 11/07/2023 | Final Reading, CC | ||
Council | 11/07/2023 | Retained by the Council | ||
Council | 11/01/2023 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |