District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-0550 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 11/07/2023

                              	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
1 
 
AN ACT 
 
______________ 
 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
 
_____________________________                               
 
 
To amend, on an emergency basis due to congressional review, Chapter 38 of Title 28 of the 
District of Columbia Official Code to require credit reporting agencies to accept a 
personal statement from a consumer indicating the consumer experienced financial 
hardship resulting from a public health emergency; to prohibit users of credit reports 
from taking into consideration adverse information in a report that was the result of the 
consumer’s action or inaction that occurred during the public health emergency; to 
require credit reporting agencies to notify residents of the right to request a personal 
statement; and to provide for civil action for such violations. 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
act may be cited as the “Public Health Emergency Credit Alert Congressional Review 
Emergency Amendment Act of 2023”. 
 
 Sec. 2. Chapter 38 of Title 28 of the District of Columbia Official Code is amended as 
follows:  
(a) The table of contents is amended by adding a new subchapter designation to read as 
follows:  
“Subchapter IV. Public Health Emergency Credit Alert.  
“28-3871. Public health emergency credit alert.”.  
(b) A new section 28-3871 is added to read as follows:  
“§ 28-3871. COVID-19 Emergency credit alert.  
“(a)(1) If a consumer reports in good faith that the consumer has experienced financial 
hardship resulting directly or indirectly from the public health emergency declared by the Mayor 
(Mayor’s Order 2020-046) on March 11, 2020, a credit reporting agency maintaining a file on 
the consumer shall accept and include in that file a personal statement furnished by the consumer 
indicating that the consumer has been financially impacted by the COVID-19 emergency. 
“(2) A credit reporting agency shall provide that personal statement along with 
any credit report provided by the agency, beginning on the date the credit reporting agency 
receives the personal statement, unless the consumer requests that the personal statement be 
removed.     	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
2 
 
“(b) This section shall not apply to a federal credit union, as defined by 12 U.S.C. § 
1752(1), a national bank, as defined by 12 U.S.C. § 25b(a)(1), or a federal savings association, as 
defined by 12 U.S.C. § 1462(3); except, that an exception granted by this subsection shall not 
apply to any entity to which the savings clause at 12 U.S.C. § 25b(b)(2) applies.  
“(c) No user of a credit report shall consider adverse information in a report that was the 
result of an action or inaction by a consumer that occurred during, and was directly or indirectly 
the result of, the public health emergency declared by the Mayor (Mayor’s Order 2020-046) on 
March 11, 2020,, if the credit report includes a personal statement pursuant to subsection (a) of 
this section.”    
“(d) When a District resident requests a copy of a credit report pursuant to 15 U.S.C. § 
1681j, the entity providing the credit report must notify the resident of the right to request a 
personal statement to accompany the credit report.  
“(e) If a credit reporting agency violates this section, the affected consumer may bring a 
civil action consistent with 15 U.S.C. § 1681n.  
“(f)(1) The Attorney General may petition the Superior Court of the District of Columbia 
for temporary or permanent injunctive relief for, and for an award of damages for property loss 
or harm suffered by a consumer as a consequence of, a violation of this section, or fraudulent or 
deceptive conduct in violation of this section that harms a District resident. 
“(2) In an action under this section, the Attorney General may recover:  
“(A) A civil penalty not to exceed $1,000 for each violation; and  
“(B) Reasonable attorney’s fees and costs of the action.  
“(g) The following terms shall have the same meaning as defined in § 28-3861:  
“(1) Consumer;  
“(2) Credit report; and 
“(3) Credit reporting agency.   
“(h) This section shall not be construed in a manner inconsistent with 15 U.S.C. § 1681 et 
seq., or any other federal law or regulation.”.  
 
Sec. 3. Applicability. 
This act shall apply as of October 29, 2023. 
 
Sec. 4. Fiscal impact statement.  
 The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact 
statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved 
October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a).  
 
 Sec. 5. Effective date.  
 This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the 
Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and shall remain in effect for no longer than    	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
3 
 
90 days, as provided for emergency acts of the Council of the District of Columbia in section 
412(a) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 788; 
D.C. Official Code § 1-204.12(a)). 
 
 
 
 
______________________________ 
Chairman 
Council of the District of Columbia 
 
 
 
 
 
_________________________________ 
Mayor 
District of Columbia