District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-0550 Introduced / Bill

Filed 11/01/2023

                     
1 
 
 ______________________________ 1 
  Councilmember Robert C. White, Jr.  2 
  3 
  4 
 5 
 6 
 7 
 8 
 9 
A BILL 10 
 11 
______________ 12 
 13 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 14 
 15 
________________                               16 
 17 
 18 
To amend, on an emergency basis due to congressional review, Chapter 38 of Title 28 of the 19 
District of Columbia Official Code to require credit reporting agencies to accept a 20 
personal statement from a consumer indicating the consumer experienced financial 21 
hardship resulting from a public health emergency; to prohibit users of credit reports 22 
from taking into consideration adverse information in a report that was the result of the 23 
consumer’s action or inaction that occurred during the public health emergency; to 24 
require credit reporting agencies to notify residents of the right to request a personal 25 
statement; and to provide for civil action for violations of this section. 26 
 27 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 28 
act may be cited as the “Public Health Emergency Credit Alert Congressional Review 29 
Emergency Amendment Act of 2023”. 30 
 Sec. 2. Title 28 of the District of Columbia Official Code is amended as follows:  31 
(a) The table of contents for Chapter 38 is amended by adding a new subchapter 32 
designation to read as follows:  33 
“Subchapter IV. Public Health Emergency Credit Alert.  34 
“28-3871. Public health emergency credit alert.”.  35 
(b) A new section 28-3871 is added to read as follows:  36 
“§ 28-3871. COVID-19 Emergency credit alert.  37   
2 
 
“(a)(1) If a consumer reports in good faith that the consumer has experienced financial 38 
hardship resulting directly or indirectly from the public health emergency declared pursuant to  39 
section 5a of the District of Columbia Public Emergency Act of 1980, effective October 17, 2002 40 
(D.C. Law 14-194; D.C. Official Code § 7-2304.01), a credit reporting agency maintaining a file 41 
on the consumer shall accept and include in that file a personal statement furnished by the 42 
consumer indicating that the consumer has been financially impacted by the COVID-19 43 
emergency. 44 
“(2) A credit reporting agency shall provide that personal statement along with 45 
any credit report provided by the agency, beginning on the date the credit reporting agency 46 
receives the personal statement, unless the consumer requests that the personal statement be 47 
removed.  48 
“(b) This section shall not apply to a federal credit union, as defined by 12 U.S.C. § 49 
1752(1), a national bank, as defined by 12 U.S.C. § 25b(a)(1), or a federal savings association, as 50 
defined by 12 U.S.C. § 1462(3); except, that an exception granted by this subsection shall not 51 
apply to any entity to which the savings clause at 12 U.S.C. § 25b(b)(2) applies.  52 
“(c)(1) No user of a credit report shall consider adverse information in a report that was 53 
the result of an action or inaction by a consumer that occurred during, and was directly or 54 
indirectly the result of, a public health emergency declared pursuant to section 5a of the District 55 
of Columbia Public Emergency Act of 1980, effective October 17, 2002 (D.C. Law 14-194; D.C. 56 
Official Code § 7-2304.01), if the credit report includes a personal statement pursuant to 57 
subsection (a) of this section.”  58 
  59   
3 
 
“(d) When a District resident requests a copy of a credit report pursuant to 15 U.S.C. § 60 
1681j, the entity providing the credit report must notify the resident of the right to request a 61 
personal statement to accompany the credit report.  62 
“(e) If a credit reporting agency violates this section, the affected consumer may bring a 63 
civil action consistent with 15 U.S.C. § 1681n.  64 
“(f)(1) The Attorney General may petition the Superior Court of the District of Columbia 65 
for temporary or permanent injunctive relief for, and for an award of damages for property loss 66 
or harm suffered by a consumer as a consequence of, a violation of this section, or fraudulent or 67 
deceptive conduct in violation of this section that harms a District resident. 68 
“(2) In an action under this section, the Attorney General may recover:  69 
“(A) A civil penalty not to exceed $1,000 for each violation; and  70 
“(B) Reasonable attorney’s fees and costs of the action.  71 
“(g) The following terms shall have the same meaning as defined in § 28-3861:  72 
“(1) “Consumer;”  73 
“(2) “Credit report;” and 74 
“(3) “Credit reporting agency”.   75 
“(h) This section shall not be construed in a manner inconsistent with the Fair Credit 76 
Reporting Act, (15 U.S.C. § 1681 et seq.), or any other federal law or regulation.”.  77 
Sec. 3. Applicability. 78 
This act shall apply as of October 29, 2023. 79 
Sec. 4. Fiscal impact.  80   
4 
 
 The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact 81 
statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved 82 
October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a).  83 
 Sec. 5. Effective date.  84 
 This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the 85 
Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and shall remain in effect for no longer than 86 
90 days, as provided for emergency acts of the Council of the District of Columbia in section 87 
412(a) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 788; 88 
D.C. Official Code § 1-204.12(a)). 89