Council | 02/16/2024 | Public Hearing Held | ||
Council | 02/14/2024 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 01/26/2024 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 01/23/2024 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 12/19/2023 | Referred to Committee on Public Works and Operations | ||
Council | 12/15/2023 | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0620 Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 12/07/2023 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |