Council | 02/09/2024 | Act A25-0393 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 001481, Expires on May 05, 2024 | ||
Council | 02/05/2024 | Returned from Mayor | ||
Council | 02/05/2024 | Enacted without Mayor's Signature with Act Number A25-0393, Expires on May 05, 2024 | ||
Council | 01/22/2024 | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on February 5, 2024 | ||
Council | 01/09/2024 | Final Reading, CC | ||
Council | 01/09/2024 | Retained by the Council | ||
Council | 01/04/2024 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |