8 | | - | AN ACT |
---|
9 | | - | |
---|
10 | | - | ________________ |
---|
11 | | - | |
---|
12 | | - | IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA |
---|
13 | | - | |
---|
14 | | - | _________________________ |
---|
15 | | - | |
---|
16 | | - | |
---|
17 | | - | To amend, on an emergency basis, due to congressional review, the Sexual Harassment |
---|
18 | | - | Investigation Review Congressional Review Emergency Act of 2023 and the Sexual |
---|
19 | | - | Harassment Investigation Review Temporary Act of 2023 to require the Inspector |
---|
20 | | - | General to hire, subject to funding availability, an independent counsel in Fiscal Year |
---|
21 | | - | 2024 and to produce a report of findings no later than 120 days after the award of a |
---|
22 | | - | contract with an independent counsel. |
---|
23 | | - | |
---|
24 | | - | BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this |
---|
25 | | - | act may be cited as the “Sexual Harassment Investigation Review Clarification Congressional |
---|
26 | | - | Review Emergency Amendment Act of 2024”. |
---|
27 | | - | |
---|
28 | | - | Sec. 2. Section 2 of the Sexual Harassment Investigation Review Congressional Review |
---|
29 | | - | Emergency Act of 2023, effective October 31, 2023 (D.C. Act 25-292; 70 DCR 14518), is |
---|
30 | | - | amended as follows: |
---|
31 | | - | (a) Subsection (a) is amended by striking the phrase “Fiscal Year 2023” and inserting the |
---|
32 | | - | phrase “Fiscal Year 2024” in its place. |
---|
33 | | - | (b) Subsection (b) is amended to read as follows: |
---|
34 | | - | “(b) The Inspector General shall provide findings to the Mayor and Council no later than |
---|
35 | | - | 120 days after the award of a contract pursuant to subsection (a) of this section.”. |
---|
36 | | - | |
---|
37 | | - | Sec. 3. Section 2 of the Sexual Harassment Investigation Review Temporary Act of 2023, |
---|
38 | | - | effective November 28, 2023 (D.C. Law 25-79; 70 DCR 13814), is amended as follows: |
---|
39 | | - | (a) Subsection (a) is amended by striking the phrase “Fiscal Year 2023” and inserting the |
---|
40 | | - | phrase “Fiscal Year 2024” in its place. |
---|
41 | | - | (b) Subsection (b) is amended to read as follows: |
---|
42 | | - | “(b) The Inspector General shall provide findings to the Mayor and Council no later than |
---|
43 | | - | 120 days after the award of a contract pursuant to subsection (a) of this section.” |
---|
44 | | - | |
---|
45 | | - | ENROLLED ORIGINAL |
---|
46 | | - | |
---|
47 | | - | |
---|
48 | | - | |
---|
49 | | - | |
---|
| 4 | + | 1 |
---|
| 5 | + | 2 |
---|
| 6 | + | _____________________________ 3 |
---|
| 7 | + | Councilmember Brianne K. Nadeau 4 |
---|
| 8 | + | 5 |
---|
| 9 | + | 6 |
---|
| 10 | + | A BILL 7 |
---|
| 11 | + | 8 |
---|
| 12 | + | _________________________ 9 |
---|
| 13 | + | 10 |
---|
| 14 | + | IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 11 |
---|
| 15 | + | 12 |
---|
| 16 | + | _________________________ 13 |
---|
| 17 | + | 14 |
---|
| 18 | + | 15 |
---|
| 19 | + | To amend, on an emergency basis, due to congressional review, the Sexual Harassment 16 |
---|
| 20 | + | Investigation Review Congressional Review Emergency Act of 2023 and the Sexual 17 |
---|
| 21 | + | Harassment Investigation Review Temporary Act of 2023 to require the Inspector 18 |
---|
| 22 | + | General to hire, subject to funding availability, an independent counsel in Fiscal Year 19 |
---|
| 23 | + | 2024 and to produce a report of findings no later than 120 days after the award of a 20 |
---|
| 24 | + | contract with an independent counsel. 21 |
---|
| 25 | + | 22 |
---|
| 26 | + | BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 23 |
---|
| 27 | + | act may be cited as the “Sexual Harassment Investigation Review Clarification Congressional 24 |
---|
| 28 | + | Review Emergency Amendment Act of 2024”. 25 |
---|
| 29 | + | Sec. 2. Section 2 of the Sexual Harassment Investigation Review Congressional Review 26 |
---|
| 30 | + | Emergency Act of 2023, passed on 1st reading on October 3, 2023 (Enrolled version of Bill 25-27 |
---|
| 31 | + | 518), is amended as follows: 28 |
---|
| 32 | + | (a) Subsection (a) is amended by striking the phrase “Fiscal Year 2023” and inserting 29 |
---|
| 33 | + | “Fiscal Year 2024” in its place. 30 |
---|
| 34 | + | (b) Subsection (b) is amended to read as follows: 31 |
---|
| 35 | + | “(b) The Inspector General shall provide findings to the Mayor and Council no later than 32 |
---|
| 36 | + | 120 days after the award of a contract pursuant to subsection (a) of this section.” 33 |
---|
52 | | - | |
---|
53 | | - | Sec. 3. Fiscal impact statement. |
---|
54 | | - | The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact |
---|
55 | | - | statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved |
---|
56 | | - | October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a). |
---|
57 | | - | |
---|
58 | | - | Sec. 4. Effective date. |
---|
59 | | - | This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the |
---|
60 | | - | Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and shall remain in effect for no longer than |
---|
61 | | - | 90 days, as provided for emergency acts of the Council of the District of Columbia in section |
---|
62 | | - | 412(a) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 788; |
---|
63 | | - | D.C. Official Code § 1-204.12(a)). |
---|
64 | | - | |
---|
65 | | - | |
---|
66 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
67 | | - | Chairman |
---|
68 | | - | Council of the District of Columbia |
---|
69 | | - | |
---|
70 | | - | |
---|
71 | | - | |
---|
72 | | - | |
---|
73 | | - | |
---|
74 | | - | _________________________________ |
---|
75 | | - | Mayor |
---|
76 | | - | District of Columbia |
---|
77 | | - | |
---|
78 | | - | |
---|
79 | | - | |
---|
80 | | - | |
---|
| 39 | + | Sec. 3. Section 2 of the Sexual Harassment Investigation Review Temporary Act of 2023, 34 |
---|
| 40 | + | passed on 2nd reading on September 19, 2023 (Enrolled version of Bill 25-382), is amended as 35 |
---|
| 41 | + | follows: 36 |
---|
| 42 | + | (a) Subsection (a) is amended by striking the phrase “Fiscal Year 2023” and inserting 37 |
---|
| 43 | + | “Fiscal Year 2024” in its place. 38 |
---|
| 44 | + | (b) Subsection (b) is amended to read as follows: 39 |
---|
| 45 | + | “(b) The Inspector General shall provide findings to the Mayor and Council no later than 40 |
---|
| 46 | + | 120 days after the award of a contract pursuant to subsection (a) of this section.” 41 |
---|
| 47 | + | Sec. 3. Fiscal impact statement. 42 |
---|
| 48 | + | The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact 43 |
---|
| 49 | + | statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved 44 |
---|
| 50 | + | October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a). 45 |
---|
| 51 | + | Sec. 4. Effective date. 46 |
---|
| 52 | + | This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the 47 |
---|
| 53 | + | Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and shall remain in effect for no longer than 48 |
---|
| 54 | + | 90 days, as provided for emergency acts of the Council of the District of Columbia in section 49 |
---|
| 55 | + | 412(a) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 788; 50 |
---|
| 56 | + | D.C. Official Code § 1-204.12(a)). 51 |
---|