District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-0642 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 01/09/2024

                              	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
1 
 
AN ACT 
 
________________ 
 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
 
_________________________ 
 
 
To amend, on an emergency basis, due to congressional review, the Sexual Harassment 
Investigation Review Congressional Review Emergency Act of 2023 and the Sexual 
Harassment Investigation Review Temporary Act of 2023 to require the Inspector 
General to hire, subject to funding availability, an independent counsel in Fiscal Year 
2024 and to produce a report of findings no later than 120 days after the award of a 
contract with an independent counsel.  
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
act may be cited as the “Sexual Harassment Investigation Review Clarification Congressional 
Review Emergency Amendment Act of 2024”. 
 
Sec. 2. Section 2 of the Sexual Harassment Investigation Review Congressional Review 
Emergency Act of 2023, effective October 31, 2023 (D.C. Act 25-292; 70 DCR 14518), is 
amended as follows: 
(a) Subsection (a) is amended by striking the phrase “Fiscal Year 2023” and inserting the 
phrase “Fiscal Year 2024” in its place. 
(b) Subsection (b) is amended to read as follows:  
“(b) The Inspector General shall provide findings to the Mayor and Council no later than 
120 days after the award of a contract pursuant to subsection (a) of this section.”. 
 
Sec. 3. Section 2 of the Sexual Harassment Investigation Review Temporary Act of 2023,  
effective November 28, 2023 (D.C. Law 25-79; 70 DCR 13814), is amended as follows: 
(a) Subsection (a) is amended by striking the phrase “Fiscal Year 2023” and inserting the 
phrase “Fiscal Year 2024” in its place. 
(b) Subsection (b) is amended to read as follows:  
“(b) The Inspector General shall provide findings to the Mayor and Council no later than 
120 days after the award of a contract pursuant to subsection (a) of this section.” 
 
    	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
2 
 
 
Sec. 3. Fiscal impact statement. 
 The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact 
statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved 
October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a). 
 
 Sec. 4.  Effective date. 
This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the 
Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and shall remain in effect for no longer than 
90 days, as provided for emergency acts of the Council of the District of Columbia in section 
412(a) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 788; 
D.C. Official Code § 1-204.12(a)). 
 
 
______________________________ 
Chairman 
Council of the District of Columbia 
 
 
 
 
 
_________________________________ 
Mayor 
District of Columbia