District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-0642 Introduced / Bill

Filed 01/04/2024

                     
1 
 
 1 
 2 
  _____________________________ 3 
  Councilmember Brianne K. Nadeau 4 
 5 
 6 
A BILL 7 
 8 
_________________________ 9 
 10 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 11 
 12 
_________________________ 13 
 14 
 15 
To amend, on an emergency basis, due to congressional review, the Sexual Harassment 16 
Investigation Review Congressional Review Emergency Act of 2023 and the Sexual 17 
Harassment Investigation Review Temporary Act of 2023 to require the Inspector 18 
General to hire, subject to funding availability, an independent counsel in Fiscal Year 19 
2024 and to produce a report of findings no later than 120 days after the award of a 20 
contract with an independent counsel.  21 
 22 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 23 
act may be cited as the “Sexual Harassment Investigation Review Clarification Congressional 24 
Review Emergency Amendment Act of 2024”. 25 
Sec. 2. Section 2 of the Sexual Harassment Investigation Review Congressional Review 26 
Emergency Act of 2023, passed on 1st reading on October 3, 2023 (Enrolled version of Bill 25-27 
518), is amended as follows: 28 
(a) Subsection (a) is amended by striking the phrase “Fiscal Year 2023” and inserting 29 
“Fiscal Year 2024” in its place. 30 
(b) Subsection (b) is amended to read as follows:  31 
“(b) The Inspector General shall provide findings to the Mayor and Council no later than 32 
120 days after the award of a contract pursuant to subsection (a) of this section.” 33   
2 
 
Sec. 3. Section 2 of the Sexual Harassment Investigation Review Temporary Act of 2023, 34 
passed on 2nd reading on September 19, 2023 (Enrolled version of Bill 25-382), is amended as 35 
follows: 36 
(a) Subsection (a) is amended by striking the phrase “Fiscal Year 2023” and inserting 37 
“Fiscal Year 2024” in its place. 38 
(b) Subsection (b) is amended to read as follows:  39 
“(b) The Inspector General shall provide findings to the Mayor and Council no later than 40 
120 days after the award of a contract pursuant to subsection (a) of this section.” 41 
Sec. 3. Fiscal impact statement. 42 
 The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact 43 
statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved 44 
October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a). 45 
 Sec. 4.  Effective date. 46 
This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the 47 
Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and shall remain in effect for no longer than 48 
90 days, as provided for emergency acts of the Council of the District of Columbia in section 49 
412(a) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 788; 50 
D.C. Official Code § 1-204.12(a)). 51