Council | 06/11/2024 | Postponed Indefinitely | ||
Council | 06/11/2024 | MOTION TO RECONSIDER (CM Pinto) | ||
Council | 04/02/2024 | Final Reading | ||
Council | 03/08/2024 | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0736 Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 03/05/2024 | First Reading | ||
Council | 03/05/2024 | Retained by the Council | ||
Council | 03/04/2024 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |