Council | 04/26/2024 | Act A25-0439 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 004615, Expires on Jul 14, 2024 | ||
Council | 04/17/2024 | Returned from Mayor | ||
Council | 04/15/2024 | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0439, Expires on Jul 14, 2024 | ||
Council | 04/08/2024 | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on April 22, 2024 | ||
Council | 04/02/2024 | Final Reading, CC | ||
Council | 04/02/2024 | Retained by the Council | ||
Council | 03/26/2024 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |