District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-0755 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 04/02/2024

                              	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 	1 
AN ACT 
 
_________________ 
 
 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
 
____________________________ 
 
 
To approve, on an emergency basis, Contract No. CW103312 with McWard Real Estate, LLC 
d/b/a The Family Laundromat, and Modification Nos. 1, 2, 3,4, 5, and 6 thereto, to 
provide emergency laundry services for migrant families and individuals arriving from 
the Arizona-Mexico and Texas-Mexico borders, and to authorize payment for the goods 
and services received and to be received under the contract and modifications. 
 
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
act may be cited as the “Contract No. CW103312 with McWard Real Estate, LLC d/b/a The 
Family Laundromat Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Act of 2024”. 
 
Sec. 2.  Pursuant to section 451 of the Home Rule Act (D.C. Official Code § 1-204.51) 
and notwithstanding the requirements of section 202 of the Procurement Practices Reform Act of 
2010, effective April 8, 2011 (D.C. Law 18-371; D.C. Official Code § 2-352.02), the Council 
approves Contract No. CW103312 with McWard Real Estate, LLC d/b/a The Family 
Laundromat, and Modification Nos. 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, and 6 thereto, to provide emergency laundry 
services for migrant families and individuals arriving from the Arizona-Mexico and Texas-
Mexico borders and authorizes payment in the not-to-exceed amount of $1,700,000 for the goods 
and services received from November 1, 2022 through September 30, 2023 and payment in the 
not-to-exceed amount of $1,628,626 for goods and services received and to be received during 
the period October 1, 2023 through September 30, 2024. 
 
 Sec. 3. Fiscal impact statement.   
The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Chief Financial Officer as the fiscal 
impact statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, 
approved October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a). 
 
Sec. 4. Effective date. 
This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the 
Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and shall remain in effect for no longer than 
90 days, as provided for emergency acts of the Council of the District of Columbia in section    	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 	2 
412(a) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 788; 
D.C. Official Code § 1-204.12(a)).  
 
 
 
 
______________________________ 
Chairman 
Council of the District of Columbia 
 
 
 
 
 
_________________________________ 
Mayor 
District of Columbia