Council | 09/27/2024 | Law L25-0216, Effective from Sep 18, 2024 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 011541, Expires on May 01, 2025 | ||
Council | 08/06/2024 | Transmitted to Congress | ||
Council | 08/06/2024 | Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is Dec 07, 2024 | ||
Council | 08/02/2024 | Act A25-0521 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 009575 | ||
Council | 07/24/2024 | Returned from Mayor | ||
Council | 07/23/2024 | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0521 | ||
Council | 07/15/2024 | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on July 29, 2024 | ||
Council | 07/09/2024 | Final Reading, CC | ||
Council | 06/25/2024 | First Reading | ||
Council | 06/25/2024 | Retained by the Council | ||
Council | 06/24/2024 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |