Council | 11/25/2024 | Returned from Mayor | ||
Council | 11/22/2024 | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0640 | ||
Council | 11/19/2024 | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on December 4, 2024 | ||
Council | 11/12/2024 | Final Reading | ||
Council | 11/01/2024 | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-1013 Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 10/29/2024 | Retained by the Council | ||
Council | 10/28/2024 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |