District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-1013 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 11/12/2024

                              	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
1 
 
AN ACT 
 
_____________ 
 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
 
_________________________ 
  
To amend, on a temporary basis, the Residential Tranquility Act of 2010 to prohibit persons 
targeting a residence for purposes of a demonstration from using sound amplifying 	devices in a residential zone between 7:00 p.m. and 9:00 a.m., and to prohibit a person 	from launching or throwing a projectile onto the residential property of another with the 	intent to cause fear, intimidate, or retaliate against any person living or working at that 	residence; and to amend the National Capital Revitalization and Self-Government 
Improvement Act of 1997 to provide that the term expiration date for a Council 	appointment to the Corrections Information Council shall be December 7th of the year in 	which the term expires. 
  
BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
act may be cited as the “Residential Tranquility Temporary Amendment Act of 2024”. 
 	Sec. 2. The Residential Tranquility Act of 2010, effective May 26, 2011 (D.C. Law 18-
374; D.C. Official Code § 22-2751 et seq.	), is amended as follows: 
(a) Section 2 (D.C. Official Code § 22-2751) is amended by adding a new paragraph (4) 
to read as follows: 
“(4) “Sound amplifying device” means any machine, device, or loudspeaker that 
amplifies sound of the human voice, music, or any other sound. The term “sound amplifying 	device” shall not include automobile audio systems when used and heard only by the occupants 	of the vehicle in which the automobile audio system is installed, personal hearing aids, or 	headphones.”. 
(b) Section 3 (D.C. Official Code § 22-2752) is amended by adding new subsections (a-1) 
and (a-2) to read as follows: 
“(a-1) It is unlawful for a person to use a sound amplifying device to target a residence 
for purposes of a demonstration between 7:00 p.m. and 9:00 a.m. in Residential Zones, 	Residential Flat Zones, or Residential Apartment Zones, as those terms are defined in the District 	of Columbia Zoning Regulations.    	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
2 
 
“(a-2) It is unlawful to continue or resume targeting a residence in violation of this law 
after being instructed by a law enforcement officer to cease targeting a residence in violation of 
this law.”. 
(c) A new section 3a is added to read as follows: 
“ Sec. 3a . Throwing projectiles at r	esidential property. 
“(a) It is unlawful for any person to launch or throw a projectile onto the residential 
property of another with the intent to cause fear, intimidate, or retaliate against any person living 
or working at that residence. 
“(b) A person who violates this section, upon conviction, shall be fined no more than the 
amount set forth in section 101 of the Criminal Fine Proportionality Amendment Act of 2012, 
effective June 11, 2013 (D.C. Law 19-	317; D.C. Official Code § 22-	3571.01), or incarcerated for 
no more than 90 days, or both.”.  
 
Sec. 3. Section 11201a(b)(2) of the National Capital Revitalization and Self-Government 
Improvement Act of 1997, effective October 2, 2010 (D.C. Law 18-	233; D.C. Official Code § 
24-101.01(b)(2)), is amended by adding a new subparagraph (B-1) to read as follows: 
  “(B-1) Notwithstanding any other provision of law, the term expiration date for a 
Council appointment to the Corrections Information Council shall be December 7th of the year 
in which the term expires.”. 
Sec. 4. Fiscal impact statement. 
 The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact 
statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved 
October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-	301.47a). 
 
 Sec. 5.  Effective date. 
  (a)  This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by 
the Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto) and a 30-day period of congressional 
review as provided in section 602(c)(1) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved  
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
    	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
3 
 
December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 813; D.C. Official Code § 1-	206.02(c)(1)). 
(b) This act shall expire after 225 days of its having taken effect. 
 
 
 
______________________________ 
Chairman 
Council of the District of Columbia 
 
 
 
 
 
_________________________________ 
Mayor 
District of Columbia