District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-1013 Engrossed / Bill

Filed 10/29/2024

                      	ENGROSSED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
1 
 
A BILL 1 
 2 
25-1013  3 
 4 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 5 
 6 
_________________________ 7 
 8 
 9 
To amend, on a temporary basis, the Residential Tranquility Act of 2010 to prohibit persons 10 
targeting a residence for purposes of a demonstration from using amplified sound devices 11 
in a residential zone, to prohibit a person as part of a group of 3 or more persons from 12 
targeting a residence for purposes of a demonstration between 7:00 p.m. and 9:00 a.m., 13 
and to prohibit a person from launching or throwing a projectile onto the residential 14 
property of another with the intent to cause fear, intimidate, or retaliate against any 15 
person living or working at that residence; and to amend the National Capital 16 
Revitalization and Self-Government Improvement Act of 1997 to provide that the term 17 
expiration date for a Council appointment to the Corrections Information Council shall be 18 
December 7th of the year in which the term expires. 19 
 20 
 21 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 22 
act may be cited as the “Residential Tranquility Temporary Amendment Act of 2024”. 23 
Sec. 2. The Residential Tranquility Act of 2010, effective May 26, 2011 (D.C. Law 18-24 
374; D.C. Official Code § 22-2751 et seq.), is amended as follows: 25 
(a) Section 2 (D.C. Official Code § 22-2751) is amended by adding a new paragraph (4) 26 
to read as follows: 27 
“(4) “Sound amplifying device” means any machine, device, or loudspeaker that 28 
amplifies sound of the human voice, music, or any other sound. The term “sound amplifying 29    	ENGROSSED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
2 
 
device” shall not include automobile audio systems when used and heard only by the occupants 30 
of the vehicle in which the automobile audio system is installed, personal hearing aids, or 31 
headphones.”. 32 
(b) Section 3 (D.C. Official Code § 22-2752) is amended as follows: 33 
(1) Subsection (a)(1)(A) is amended by striking the phrase “Between 10:00 p.m. 34 
and 7:00 a.m” and inserting the phrase “Between 7:00 p.m. and 9:00 a.m.” in its place. 35 
(2) New subsections (a-1) and (a-2) are added to read as follows: 36 
“(a-1) It is unlawful for a person to target a residence for purposes of a demonstration 37 
while using a sound amplifying device in Residential Zones, Residential Flat Zones, or 38 
Residential Apartment Zones, as those terms are defined in the District of Columbia Zoning 39 
Regulations. 40 
“(a-1) It is unlawful for a person to use a sound amplifying device to target a residence 41 
for purposes of a demonstration between 7:00 p.m. and 9:00 a.m. in Residential Zones, 42 
Residential Flat Zones, or Residential Apartment Zones, as those terms are defined in the District 43 
of Columbia Zoning Regulations. 44 
“(a-2) It is unlawful to continue or resume targeting a residence in violation of this law 45 
after being instructed by a law enforcement officer to cease targeting a residence in violation of 46 
this law.”. 47 
(c) A new section 3a is added to read as follows: 48 
“ Sec. 3a. Throwing projectiles at residential property. 49    	ENGROSSED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
3 
 
“(a) It is unlawful for any person to launch or throw a projectile onto the residential 50 
property of another with the intent to cause fear, intimidate, or retaliate against any person living 51 
or working at that residence.”.  52 
“(b) A person who violates this section, upon conviction, shall be fined no more than the 53 
amount set forth in section 101 of the Criminal Fine Proportionality Amendment Act of 2012, 54 
effective June 11, 2013 (D.C. Law 19-317; D.C. Official Code § 22-3571.01), or incarcerated for 55 
no more than 90 days, or both.”.  56 
Sec. 3. Section 11201a(b)(2) of the National Capital Revitalization and Self-Government 57 
Improvement Act of 1997, effective October 2, 2010 (D.C. Law 18-233; D.C. Official Code § 58 
24-101.01(b)(2)),  is amended by adding a new subparagraph (B-1) to read as follows: 59 
  “(B-1) Notwithstanding any other provision of law, the term expiration 60 
date for a Council appointment to the Corrections Information Council shall be December 7th of 61 
the year in which the term expires.”. 62 
Sec. 4. Fiscal impact statement. 63 
 The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact 64 
statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved 65 
October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a). 66 
 Sec. 5.  Effective date. 67    	ENGROSSED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
4 
 
(a) This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by 68 
the Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), a 30-day period of congressional review 69 
as provided in section 602(c)(1) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 70 
24, 1973 (87 Stat. 813; D.C. Official Code § 1-206.02(c)(1)), and publication in the District of 71 
Columbia Register. 72 
(b) This act shall expire after 225 days of its having taken effect. 73