Council | 10/05/2023 | Withdrawn | ||
Council | 06/30/2023 | Roundtable Hearing Held | ||
Council | 06/16/2023 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 06/14/2023 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 05/19/2023 | Notice of Intent to Act on PR25-0231 Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 05/16/2023 | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole | ||
Council | 05/05/2023 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |