District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0231 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11 Dear Chairman Mendelson:
22 Sincerely,
33 ser
44 MURIEL BOWSER
55 MAYOR
66 May 5, 2023
77 The Honorable Phil Mendelson
88 Chairman
99 Council of the District of Columbia
1010 John A. Wilson Building
1111 1350Pennsylvania AvenueNW, Suite 504
1212 Washington, DC 20004
1313 In accordance with section 2 of the Confirmation Act of 1978, effective March 3, 1979 (D.C. Law
1414 2-142; D.C. Official Code § 1-523.01), and pursuant to section 8 of An Act providing for the
1515 zoning of the District of Columbia and the regulation of the location, height, bulk, and uses of
1616 buildings and other structures and of the uses of land in the District of Columbia, and for other
1717 purposes, approved June 20, 1938 (52 Stat. 799; D.C. Official Code § 6-641.07), I am pleased to
1818 nominate the following individual:
1919 for reappointment as a member of the Board of Zoning Adjustment, for a term to end September
2020 30, 2025. Enclosed you will find biographical information detailing the experience of Mr. Blake,
2121 together with a proposed resolution to assist the Council during the confirmation process.
2222 I would appreciate the Council’s earliest consideration of this nomination for confirmation.
2323 Please do not hesitate to contact me, or Steven Walker, Director, Mayor’s Office of Talent
2424 and Appointments, should the Council require additional information.
2525 Mr. Carl Blake
2626 Crittenden Street, NW
2727 Washington, DC 20011
2828 (Ward 4)
2929 Mur e A PROPOSED RESOLUTION
3030 IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
3131 To confirm the reappointment of Mr. Carl Blake to the Board of Zoning Adjustment.
3232 Sec. 2. The Council of the District of Columbia confirms the reappointment of:
3333 as a member of the Board of Zoning Adjustment, pursuant to section 8 of An Act Providing for
3434 the zoning of the District of Columbia and the regulation of the location, height, bulk, and uses28
3535 of buildings and other structures and of the uses of land in the District of Columbia, and for other29
3636 purposes, approved June 20, 1938 (52 Stat. 799; D.C. Official Code § 6-641.07), for a term to30
3737 end September 30, 2025.31
3838 Sec. 3. The Council of the District of Columbia shall transmit a copy of this resolution,32
3939 upon its adoption, to the nominee and to the Office of the Mayor.33
4040 Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately.34
4141 1
4242 2
4343 3
4444 4
4545 5
4646 6
4747 7
4848 8
4949 9
5050 10
5151 11
5252 12
5353 13
5454 14
5555 15
5656 16
5757 17
5858 18
5959 19
6060 20
6161 21
6262 22
6363 23
6464 24
6565 25
6666 26
6767 27
6868 Chainnan Phil Mendelson
6969 at the request of the Mayor
7070 Mr. Carl Blake
7171 Crittenden Street, NW
7272 Washington, DC 20011
7373 (Ward 4)
7474 RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this
7575 resolution may be cited as the “Board of Zoning Adjustment Carl Blake Confirmation Resolution
7676 of 2023”. CARL H. BLAKE, CFA
7777 PROFESSIONAL CERTIFICATIONS
7878 Chartered Financial Analyst (1992)
7979 EDUCATION
8080 MBA, Finance, Colgate Darden Graduate School of Business Administration, University of
8181 Virginia, Charlottesville, VA
8282 BA, Economics, Bowdoin College, Brunswick, ME
8383 2010 - Present, Founder/Managing Partner, Blake Properties NETT LLC, a real estate
8484 investment management and financial sendees consulting firm. Primarily a buy and hold investor,
8585 with a portfolio consisting of both passive and actively managed investments focused on residential
8686 multi-family and mixed-use properties in The District of Columbia, New York, New Jersey and
8787 North Carolina. Extensive experience with the affordable and subsidized segments of the housing
8888 market.
8989 2016-2018, Managing Director, GARA Consulting and Capital responsible for analytics,
9090 which includes identifying and evaluating investment opportunities, structuring transactions and
9191 directing deal due diligence.
9292 2010-2016, Managing Partner, CENTAURUS Greene Street provided advisory services to
9393 small to medium size business on strategic planning matters and capital structure optimization.
9494 1992 - 2010, Fundamental investment research relating to all levels of the capital structure. His
9595 experience as a credit analyst covered a diverse set of industries including telecommunications,
9696 media, energy, metals and mining, chemicals, industrials and financial institutions. Prior to
9797 becoming a credit analyst in 1994, Carl was an equity analyst covering the telecommunications
9898 industry' with a focus on the RBOC, Long-distance and CLEC sectors. For eight consecutive years
9999 (while at Smith Barney, Lehman Brothers, and TD Securities) Carl was a senior analyst on
100100 research teams ranked among the top 3 by Institutional Investor. He most recently served as a
101101 Managing Director at Gimme Credit Publications and Senior Vice President and Group Leader of
102102 the High Yield Research Group at Friedman Billings Ramsey.
103103 2014-2016, Advisor, North Avenue Research, LLC a firm comprised of renewable energy
104104 technology and finance veterans founded in 2012 to provide proprietary, independent research and
105105 due diligence support to equity and fixed income managers and to a range of clients involved in the
106106 renewable energy and energy' efficiency sectors.
107107 1984- 1990, Carl began his Wall Street research career first as an analyst at Morgan Stanley and
108108 later at Kidder Peabody, where he also worked as an associate covering distressed credits and
109109 special situations.
110110 2019 - Present, Director, Financial Planning BlueWater Group, Inc., overseeing the development of
111111 forward-looking quantitative models used in both short and long-term budgeting. These models are
112112 designed to minimize operational/performance risk, balance rate affordability', level of service
113113 requirements and optimize capital reinvestment efficiency. BlueWater is a risk management and
114114 financial consulting firm that develops and implements FMECA, business and process analytics, and
115115 life cycle performance optimization for public and private utilities in the water, power and gas
116116 industries. Carl Blake
117117 Executive Office of the Mayor - Office of Talent and Appointments
118118 John A. Wilson Building | 1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, Suite 600 | Washington, DC 20004
119119 A Ward 4 resident, Mr. Stanley has an MBA in Finance from the Colgate Darden Graduate
120120 School of Business Administration, at the University of Virginia, and a BA in Economics from
121121 Bowdoin College.
122122 Mr. Carl Blake is Director of Financial Planning at BlueWater Group,
123123 Inc., where he oversees the development of forward-looking
124124 quantitative models used in both short and long-term budgeting.
125125 BlueWater is a risk management and financial consulting firm that
126126 develops and implements FMECA, business and process analytics, and
127127 life cycle performance optimization for public and private utilities in
128128 the water, power, and gas industries.
129129 ★ ★ ★
130130 WE ARE
131131 WASHINGTON
132132 Mr. Blake also serves as founder and managing Partner at Blake
133133 Properties NETT LLC, a real estate investment management and
134134 financial services consulting firm. The firm is primarily a buy and hold
135135 investor, with a portfolio consisting of both passive and actively
136136 managed investments focused on residential multi-family and mixed-use properties in the
137137 District of Columbia, New York, New Jersey, and North Carolina. The company has extensive
138138 experience with the affordable and subsidized segments of the housing market. Elizabeth A. (Betsy) Cavendish
139139 To:
140140 From:
141141 Date:
142142 Subject:
143143 Office of the General Counsel to the Mayor
144144 GOVERNMENT OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
145145 Executive Office of Mayor Muriel Bowser
146146 ★ ★ ★
147147 WE ARE
148148 WASHINGTON
149149 Tommy Wells, Steve Walker
150150 Betsy Cavendish
151151 March 30, 2023
152152 Legal sufficiency review of Resolution nominating Carl Blake as a Member of the
153153 Board of Zoning Adjustment__________________________________________
154154 This is to Certify that this office has reviewed the above-referenced resolution and
155155 found it to be legally unobjectionable. If you have any questions in this regard, please do not
156156 hesitate to call Vanessa Careiro, Deputy General Counsel, Executive Office of the Mayor, at
157157 202-724-1303, or me at 202-724-7681.
158158 The John A. Wilson Building • 1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW • Suite 300 • Washington, D.C. 20004 • Office (202) 724-7681