Dear Chairman Mendelson: Sincerely, ser MURIEL BOWSER MAYOR May 5, 2023 The Honorable Phil Mendelson Chairman Council of the District of Columbia John A. Wilson Building 1350Pennsylvania AvenueNW, Suite 504 Washington, DC 20004 In accordance with section 2 of the Confirmation Act of 1978, effective March 3, 1979 (D.C. Law 2-142; D.C. Official Code § 1-523.01), and pursuant to section 8 of An Act providing for the zoning of the District of Columbia and the regulation of the location, height, bulk, and uses of buildings and other structures and of the uses of land in the District of Columbia, and for other purposes, approved June 20, 1938 (52 Stat. 799; D.C. Official Code § 6-641.07), I am pleased to nominate the following individual: for reappointment as a member of the Board of Zoning Adjustment, for a term to end September 30, 2025. Enclosed you will find biographical information detailing the experience of Mr. Blake, together with a proposed resolution to assist the Council during the confirmation process. I would appreciate the Council’s earliest consideration of this nomination for confirmation. Please do not hesitate to contact me, or Steven Walker, Director, Mayor’s Office of Talent and Appointments, should the Council require additional information. Mr. Carl Blake Crittenden Street, NW Washington, DC 20011 (Ward 4) Mur e A PROPOSED RESOLUTION IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA To confirm the reappointment of Mr. Carl Blake to the Board of Zoning Adjustment. Sec. 2. The Council of the District of Columbia confirms the reappointment of: as a member of the Board of Zoning Adjustment, pursuant to section 8 of An Act Providing for the zoning of the District of Columbia and the regulation of the location, height, bulk, and uses28 of buildings and other structures and of the uses of land in the District of Columbia, and for other29 purposes, approved June 20, 1938 (52 Stat. 799; D.C. Official Code § 6-641.07), for a term to30 end September 30, 2025.31 Sec. 3. The Council of the District of Columbia shall transmit a copy of this resolution,32 upon its adoption, to the nominee and to the Office of the Mayor.33 Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately.34 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 25 26 27 Chainnan Phil Mendelson at the request of the Mayor Mr. Carl Blake Crittenden Street, NW Washington, DC 20011 (Ward 4) RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this resolution may be cited as the “Board of Zoning Adjustment Carl Blake Confirmation Resolution of 2023”. CARL H. BLAKE, CFA PROFESSIONAL CERTIFICATIONS Chartered Financial Analyst (1992) EDUCATION MBA, Finance, Colgate Darden Graduate School of Business Administration, University of Virginia, Charlottesville, VA BA, Economics, Bowdoin College, Brunswick, ME 2010 - Present, Founder/Managing Partner, Blake Properties NETT LLC, a real estate investment management and financial sendees consulting firm. Primarily a buy and hold investor, with a portfolio consisting of both passive and actively managed investments focused on residential multi-family and mixed-use properties in The District of Columbia, New York, New Jersey and North Carolina. Extensive experience with the affordable and subsidized segments of the housing market. 2016-2018, Managing Director, GARA Consulting and Capital responsible for analytics, which includes identifying and evaluating investment opportunities, structuring transactions and directing deal due diligence. 2010-2016, Managing Partner, CENTAURUS Greene Street provided advisory services to small to medium size business on strategic planning matters and capital structure optimization. 1992 - 2010, Fundamental investment research relating to all levels of the capital structure. His experience as a credit analyst covered a diverse set of industries including telecommunications, media, energy, metals and mining, chemicals, industrials and financial institutions. Prior to becoming a credit analyst in 1994, Carl was an equity analyst covering the telecommunications industry' with a focus on the RBOC, Long-distance and CLEC sectors. For eight consecutive years (while at Smith Barney, Lehman Brothers, and TD Securities) Carl was a senior analyst on research teams ranked among the top 3 by Institutional Investor. He most recently served as a Managing Director at Gimme Credit Publications and Senior Vice President and Group Leader of the High Yield Research Group at Friedman Billings Ramsey. 2014-2016, Advisor, North Avenue Research, LLC a firm comprised of renewable energy technology and finance veterans founded in 2012 to provide proprietary, independent research and due diligence support to equity and fixed income managers and to a range of clients involved in the renewable energy and energy' efficiency sectors. 1984- 1990, Carl began his Wall Street research career first as an analyst at Morgan Stanley and later at Kidder Peabody, where he also worked as an associate covering distressed credits and special situations. 2019 - Present, Director, Financial Planning BlueWater Group, Inc., overseeing the development of forward-looking quantitative models used in both short and long-term budgeting. These models are designed to minimize operational/performance risk, balance rate affordability', level of service requirements and optimize capital reinvestment efficiency. BlueWater is a risk management and financial consulting firm that develops and implements FMECA, business and process analytics, and life cycle performance optimization for public and private utilities in the water, power and gas industries. Carl Blake Executive Office of the Mayor - Office of Talent and Appointments John A. Wilson Building | 1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, Suite 600 | Washington, DC 20004 A Ward 4 resident, Mr. Stanley has an MBA in Finance from the Colgate Darden Graduate School of Business Administration, at the University of Virginia, and a BA in Economics from Bowdoin College. Mr. Carl Blake is Director of Financial Planning at BlueWater Group, Inc., where he oversees the development of forward-looking quantitative models used in both short and long-term budgeting. BlueWater is a risk management and financial consulting firm that develops and implements FMECA, business and process analytics, and life cycle performance optimization for public and private utilities in the water, power, and gas industries. ★ ★ ★ WE ARE WASHINGTON Mr. Blake also serves as founder and managing Partner at Blake Properties NETT LLC, a real estate investment management and financial services consulting firm. The firm is primarily a buy and hold investor, with a portfolio consisting of both passive and actively managed investments focused on residential multi-family and mixed-use properties in the District of Columbia, New York, New Jersey, and North Carolina. The company has extensive experience with the affordable and subsidized segments of the housing market. Elizabeth A. (Betsy) Cavendish To: From: Date: Subject: Office of the General Counsel to the Mayor GOVERNMENT OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA Executive Office of Mayor Muriel Bowser ★ ★ ★ WE ARE WASHINGTON Tommy Wells, Steve Walker Betsy Cavendish March 30, 2023 Legal sufficiency review of Resolution nominating Carl Blake as a Member of the Board of Zoning Adjustment__________________________________________ This is to Certify that this office has reviewed the above-referenced resolution and found it to be legally unobjectionable. If you have any questions in this regard, please do not hesitate to call Vanessa Careiro, Deputy General Counsel, Executive Office of the Mayor, at 202-724-1303, or me at 202-724-7681. The John A. Wilson Building • 1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW • Suite 300 • Washington, D.C. 20004 • Office (202) 724-7681