Council | 02/02/2024 | Resolution R25-0249, Effective from Sep 19, 2023 Published in DC Register Page 001227 | ||
Council | 10/31/2023 | Committee Report Filed | ||
Council | 09/19/2023 | Final Reading, CC | ||
Council | 09/19/2023 | Committee Mark-up of PR25-0299 | ||
Council | 09/19/2023 | Approved with Resolution Number R25-0249 | ||
Council | 07/11/2023 | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole | ||
Council | 07/07/2023 | Roundtable Hearing Held | ||
Council | 07/07/2023 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 07/06/2023 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 06/30/2023 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 06/30/2023 | Notice of Intent to Act on PR25-0299 Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 06/21/2023 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |