Council | 01/10/2024 | Committee Report Filed | ||
Council | 12/15/2023 | Resolution R25-0370, Effective from Dec 05, 2023 Published in DC Register Page 015743 | ||
Council | 12/05/2023 | Approved with Resolution Number R25-0370 | ||
Council | 12/05/2023 | Final Reading, CC | ||
Council | 12/05/2023 | Committee Mark-up of PR25-0300 | ||
Council | 11/15/2023 | Public Hearing Held | ||
Council | 10/20/2023 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 10/18/2023 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 07/11/2023 | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole | ||
Council | 06/30/2023 | Notice of Intent to Act on PR25-0300 Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 06/21/2023 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |