Council | 07/05/2024 | Resolution R25-0535, Effective from Jun 25, 2024 Published in DC Register Page 007621 | ||
Council | 06/25/2024 | Final Reading, CC | ||
Council | 06/25/2024 | Approved with Resolution Number R25-0535 | ||
Council | 06/10/2024 | Committee Report Filed | ||
Council | 06/05/2024 | Committee Mark-up of PR25-0690 | ||
Council | 06/04/2024 | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary | ||
Council | 05/30/2024 | Roundtable Hearing Held | ||
Council | 05/10/2024 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 05/06/2024 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 04/02/2024 | Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment | ||
Council | 03/29/2024 | Notice of Intent to Act on PR25-0690 Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 03/21/2024 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |