District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0690 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 06/25/2024

                              	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
 
A RESOLUTION 
  
25-535  
 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
 
June 25, 2024 
 
 
To confirm the reappointment of Mr. Robert Bobb to the Board of Directors of the Washington 
Metrorail Safety Commission.  
 
RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
resolution may be cited as the “Board of Directors of the Washington Metrorail Safety 
Commission Robert C. Bobb Confirmation Resolution of 2024”. 
 
 Sec. 2. The Council of the District of Columbia confirms the reappointment of: 
 
Mr. Robert Bobb 
Taylor Street, NW 
Washington, DC 20011 
  (Ward 4) 
 
as a principal member of the Board of Directors of the Washington Metrorail Safety 
Commission, established by Article III.B in section 2 of the Washington Metrorail Safety 
Commission Establishment Act of 2016, effective April 7, 2017 (D.C. Law 21-250; D.C. Official 
Code § 9-1109.11), and the Washington Metrorail Safety Commission Board of Directors 
Amendment Act of 2018, effective March 29, 2018 (D.C. Law 22-84, 65 DCR 1590), for a term 
to end February 9, 2028.  
 
 Sec. 3. The Council shall transmit a copy of this resolution, upon its adoption, to the 
nominee and to the Mayor.  
 
 Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately.