Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0067 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill September 2, 2021

Analysis

Analysis March 11, 2022
Analysis February 24, 2022
Analysis December 3, 2021
Analysis November 24, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill February 24, 2022
Bill December 3, 2021