House
|
03/04/2022
|
Laid on Table, refer to CS/SB 754
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Substituted CS/SB 754
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/4/2022)
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2022
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2022
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2022
|
Reported out of Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2022
|
Favorable by Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/14/2022
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
01/14/2022
|
Added to Commerce Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/14/2022
|
Now in Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/14/2022
|
Referred to Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2022
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2022
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2022
|
Reported out of Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2022
|
Favorable with CS by Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2022
|
Added to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
10/22/2021
|
Now in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
10/22/2021
|
Referred to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
10/01/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|