Senate
|
03/14/2022
|
Died in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2022
|
Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Referred to Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
In Messages
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
CS passed; YEAS 115, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/1/2022)
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Reported out of Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Favorable by Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
Added to Education & Employment Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2022
|
Now in Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2022
|
Referred to Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2022
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2022
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2022
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2022
|
Reported out of Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2022
|
Favorable with CS by Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2022
|
Added to Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
10/22/2021
|
Now in Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
10/22/2021
|
Referred to Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
10/04/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|