House
|
03/14/2022
|
Died on Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2022
|
Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Reported out of State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Favorable by State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2022
|
Added to State Affairs Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2022
|
Now in State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2022
|
Referred to State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2022
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2022
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2022
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2022
|
Reported out of Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2022
|
Favorable with CS by Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2022
|
Added to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
12/01/2021
|
Now in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/01/2021
|
Reported out of Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/01/2021
|
Favorable by Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/23/2021
|
Added to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
11/05/2021
|
Now in Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/05/2021
|
Referred to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/05/2021
|
Referred to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
10/25/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|