Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0403 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill October 25, 2021

Analysis

Analysis February 28, 2022
Analysis February 27, 2022
Analysis February 16, 2022
Analysis February 14, 2022
Analysis December 1, 2021
Analysis November 23, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill February 16, 2022