House
|
03/14/2022
|
Died in State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2022
|
Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2022
|
Now in State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2022
|
Reported out of Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2022
|
Favorable by Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
Added to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
Now in Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
Referred to State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
Referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2022
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Reported out of Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Favorable with CS by Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2022
|
Added to Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
11/05/2021
|
Now in Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/05/2021
|
Referred to Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
10/27/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|