Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0421 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill October 27, 2021

Analysis

Analysis February 14, 2022
Analysis February 11, 2022
Analysis February 8, 2022
Analysis February 4, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill February 8, 2022