House | 03/14/2022 | Died in State Affairs Committee | ||
House | 03/12/2022 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
House | 02/11/2022 | Now in State Affairs Committee | ||
House | 02/11/2022 | Referred to Commerce Committee | ||
House | 02/11/2022 | Referred to Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 02/11/2022 | Referred to State Affairs Committee | ||
House | 02/10/2022 | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) | ||
House | 02/10/2022 | CS Filed | ||
House | 02/10/2022 | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) | ||
House | 02/10/2022 | Reported out of Insurance & Banking Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/07/2022 | Favorable with CS by Insurance & Banking Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/03/2022 | PCS added to Insurance & Banking Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 01/11/2022 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 11/05/2021 | Now in Insurance & Banking Subcommittee | ||
House | 11/05/2021 | Referred to Insurance & Banking Subcommittee | ||
House | 10/27/2021 | Filed |