House
|
03/03/2022
|
Laid on Table, refer to SB 442
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Substituted SB 442
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/3/2022)
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Reported out of State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Favorable by State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2022
|
Added to State Affairs Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2022
|
Now in State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2022
|
Reported out of Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2022
|
Favorable by Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/14/2022
|
Added to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2022
|
Now in Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2022
|
Reported out of Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2022
|
Favorable by Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2022
|
Added to Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
11/19/2021
|
Now in Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/19/2021
|
Referred to State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
11/19/2021
|
Referred to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/19/2021
|
Referred to Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/10/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|