Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0571 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 10, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 9, 2022
Analysis March 9, 2022
Analysis January 26, 2022
Analysis January 24, 2022
Analysis January 19, 2022
Analysis January 14, 2022
Analysis January 12, 2022
Analysis January 10, 2022