House | 03/03/2022 | Laid on Table, refer to SM 982 | ||
House | 03/03/2022 | Substituted SM 982 | ||
House | 02/28/2022 | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/3/2022) | ||
House | 02/01/2022 | Added to Second Reading Calendar | ||
House | 02/01/2022 | Bill released to House Calendar | ||
House | 02/01/2022 | Reported out of Commerce Committee | ||
House | 02/01/2022 | Favorable by Commerce Committee | ||
House | 01/28/2022 | Added to Commerce Committee agenda | ||
House | 01/24/2022 | Now in Commerce Committee | ||
House | 01/24/2022 | Reported out of Ways & Means Committee | ||
House | 01/24/2022 | Favorable by Ways & Means Committee | ||
House | 01/20/2022 | Added to Ways & Means Committee agenda | ||
House | 01/11/2022 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 12/13/2021 | Now in Ways & Means Committee | ||
House | 12/13/2021 | Referred to Commerce Committee | ||
House | 12/13/2021 | Referred to Ways & Means Committee | ||
House | 11/17/2021 | Filed |