Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0641 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 17, 2021

Analysis

Analysis March 28, 2022
Analysis February 1, 2022
Analysis January 28, 2022
Analysis January 24, 2022
Analysis January 21, 2022