|
06/01/2022
|
Chapter No. 2022-148
|
|
|
|
05/26/2022
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
05/25/2022
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Substituted for CS/SB 1066
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Withdrawn from Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 115, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
Amendment 088957 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/1/2022)
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
Reported out of State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
Favorable with CS by State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2022
|
PCS added to State Affairs Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Now in State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Reported out of State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Favorable by State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2022
|
Added to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2022
|
Now in State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2022
|
Reported out of Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2022
|
Favorable by Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2022
|
Added to Insurance & Banking Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2022
|
Now in Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2022
|
Reported out of Government Operations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2022
|
Favorable by Government Operations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2022
|
Added to Government Operations Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
12/13/2021
|
Now in Government Operations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/13/2021
|
Referred to State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
12/13/2021
|
Referred to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/13/2021
|
Referred to Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/13/2021
|
Referred to Government Operations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/22/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|