Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0689 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 22, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 1, 2022

Enrolled

Bill March 8, 2022

Analysis

Analysis June 9, 2022
Analysis March 15, 2022
Analysis February 23, 2022
Analysis February 8, 2022
Analysis February 7, 2022
Analysis January 27, 2022
Analysis January 25, 2022
Analysis January 20, 2022
Analysis January 19, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill February 24, 2022