House | 03/14/2022 | Died in Commerce Committee | ||
House | 03/12/2022 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
House | 02/15/2022 | Added to Commerce Committee agenda | ||
House | 02/09/2022 | Now in Commerce Committee | ||
House | 02/09/2022 | Reported out of Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 02/09/2022 | Favorable by Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2022 | Added to Appropriations Committee agenda | ||
House | 01/27/2022 | Now in Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 01/27/2022 | Reported out of Regulatory Reform Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/27/2022 | Favorable by Regulatory Reform Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/25/2022 | Added to Regulatory Reform Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 01/11/2022 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 12/13/2021 | Now in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee | ||
House | 12/13/2021 | Referred to Commerce Committee | ||
House | 12/13/2021 | Referred to Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 12/13/2021 | Referred to Regulatory Reform Subcommittee | ||
House | 11/23/2021 | Filed |