Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0705 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 23, 2021

Analysis

Analysis February 15, 2022
Analysis February 9, 2022
Analysis February 8, 2022
Analysis January 27, 2022
Analysis January 26, 2022