House
|
03/14/2022
|
Died in Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2022
|
Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2022
|
Added to Health & Human Services Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2022
|
Now in Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2022
|
Reported out of Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2022
|
Favorable by Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2022
|
Added to Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2022
|
Now in Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2022
|
Referred to Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2022
|
Original reference removed: Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2022
|
Original reference removed: Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2022
|
Referred to Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2022
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Reported out of Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2022
|
Favorable with CS by Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/21/2022
|
PCS added to Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
12/13/2021
|
Now in Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/13/2021
|
Referred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/13/2021
|
Referred to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/13/2021
|
Referred to Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/24/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|