House
|
05/24/2022
|
Veto Message received (2022D Special Session)
|
|
|
|
04/27/2022
|
Vetoed by Governor
|
|
|
|
04/27/2022
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2022
|
CS passed; YEAS 24 NAYS 15
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2022
|
Amendment(s) failed (487084)
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2022
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Amendment(s) failed (541830, 967140, 972756)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Substituted for CS/CS/CS/SB 1024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Withdrawn from Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 83, NAYS 31
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
Amendment 932703 ruled out of order
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
Amendment 214887 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
Amendment 395669 ruled out of order
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
Amendment 923115 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
Amendment 281527 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
Amendment 733787 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
Amendment 490195 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
Amendment 297461 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
Amendment 812213 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/1/2022)
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Reported out of Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
Favorable with CS by Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2022
|
PCS added to Commerce Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2022
|
Now in Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2022
|
Reported out of State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2022
|
Favorable by State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Added to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Now in State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Referred to Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Referred to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2022
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2022
|
Reported out of Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2022
|
Favorable with CS by Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2022
|
Added to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
12/13/2021
|
Now in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/13/2021
|
Referred to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/29/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|