Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0741 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 29, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 1, 2022

Enrolled

Bill March 7, 2022

Analysis

Analysis May 3, 2022
Analysis March 14, 2022
Analysis February 24, 2022
Analysis February 21, 2022
Analysis February 18, 2022
Analysis February 3, 2022
Analysis February 1, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill February 24, 2022
Bill February 4, 2022