House
|
03/03/2022
|
Laid on Table, refer to CS/SB 1190
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Substituted CS/SB 1190
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/3/2022)
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2022
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2022
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Reported out of Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
Favorable with CS by Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2022
|
Added to Commerce Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2022
|
Now in Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2022
|
Referred to Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2022
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2022
|
Reported out of Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2022
|
Favorable with CS by Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2022
|
Added to Insurance & Banking Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
12/13/2021
|
Now in Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/13/2021
|
Referred to Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/30/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|