Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0817 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 1, 2021

Enrolled

Bill March 2, 2022

Analysis

Analysis April 8, 2022
Analysis March 23, 2022
Analysis February 1, 2022
Analysis January 31, 2022
Analysis January 20, 2022
Analysis January 18, 2022