LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Florida FL
Legislatures
2022 Regular Session
House
Bills
H0963
Draft Versions
FL
Florida House Bill H0963
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Florida 2022 Regular Session
Florida House Bill H0963
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
December 17, 2021
Compare
Engrossed
Bill
March 10, 2022
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
March 10, 2022
Compare
Analysis
Analysis
April 12, 2022
Analysis
March 23, 2022
Analysis
February 22, 2022
Analysis
February 15, 2022
Analysis
February 14, 2022
Comm Sub
Bill
February 22, 2022
Compare
Bill
February 15, 2022
Compare