Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0995 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 21, 2021

Enrolled

Bill March 10, 2022

Analysis

Analysis March 23, 2022
Analysis February 23, 2022
Analysis February 21, 2022
Analysis February 17, 2022
Analysis February 16, 2022
Analysis February 14, 2022
Analysis February 11, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill February 14, 2022