Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1005 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 21, 2021

Analysis

Analysis February 17, 2022
Analysis February 15, 2022
Analysis February 7, 2022
Analysis February 4, 2022
Analysis January 26, 2022
Analysis January 22, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill January 26, 2022