House
|
03/14/2022
|
Died on Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2022
|
Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2022
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2022
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2022
|
Reported out of State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2022
|
Favorable by State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Added to State Affairs Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2022
|
Now in State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2022
|
Reported out of State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2022
|
Favorable by State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2022
|
Added to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/21/2022
|
Now in State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/21/2022
|
Referred to State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/21/2022
|
Referred to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2022
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2022
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2022
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2022
|
Reported out of Government Operations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2022
|
Favorable with CS by Government Operations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2022
|
PCS added to Government Operations Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
01/07/2022
|
Now in Government Operations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/07/2022
|
Referred to Government Operations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/28/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|