Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1053 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 28, 2021

Analysis

Analysis February 21, 2022
Analysis February 17, 2022
Analysis February 3, 2022
Analysis February 2, 2022
Analysis January 20, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill January 20, 2022