Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1065 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 29, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 9, 2022
Analysis March 16, 2022
Analysis February 22, 2022
Analysis February 17, 2022
Analysis February 14, 2022
Analysis February 11, 2022
Analysis February 8, 2022
Analysis February 4, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill February 22, 2022