House | 03/14/2022 | Died in Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/12/2022 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
House | 01/11/2022 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 01/10/2022 | Now in Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/10/2022 | Referred to Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 01/10/2022 | Referred to Education & Employment Committee | ||
House | 01/10/2022 | Referred to Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/04/2022 | Filed |